Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3755.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |