|
08/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6250.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3672.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3447.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3348.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|