California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1027 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 9, 2024

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2024

Amended

Bill March 20, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024