|
07/02/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5887.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4022.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3725.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|