California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill June 19, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 2, 2024

Amended

Bill May 15, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024