|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 453, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 5729.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 7. Page 6892.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 4091.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3969.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
April 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3660.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|