California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1053 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill August 20, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024
Bill April 4, 2024