|
09/24/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 521, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 5588.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6654.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 4189.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3465.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|