California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1075 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2024

Amended

Bill June 24, 2024
Bill May 20, 2024
Bill May 9, 2024
Bill April 9, 2024
Bill April 8, 2024