|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 878, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6654.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4151.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3972.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
May 6 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3725.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3605.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|