California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1109 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024