|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 458, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5297.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6320.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4028.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
From consent calendar on motion of Senator Blakespear.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
April 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3630.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3532.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 16 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|