California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1156 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill June 18, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024