|
07/18/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4932.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6036.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4020.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3725.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|