California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 18, 2024

Amended

Bill June 19, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024