|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 885, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5297.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6321.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2024
|
June 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4015.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3751.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|