California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1195 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill June 17, 2024
Bill March 19, 2024