|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5297.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6321.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3772.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3563.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|