California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024