|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 465, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5650.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6801.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 4100.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3977.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3730.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3428.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|