Senate
|
09/20/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6535.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4133.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3979.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3562.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|