California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Amended

Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024