|
09/21/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 338, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5082.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6250.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3894.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
April 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3607.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|