California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2024

Amended

Bill June 19, 2024
Bill June 11, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024