|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 992, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5246.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6279.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 4057.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3758.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|