California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024