|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 482, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5646.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6704.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4183.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3984.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3727.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3606.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|