California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1452 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill June 26, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024