Senate
|
09/22/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5751.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6686.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4014.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3752.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|