California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1471 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Amended

Bill June 17, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024