|
09/20/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 328, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6503.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Assembly Rule 51.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4673.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4531.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Set for hearing June 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|