|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 3. Page 6539.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4094.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3985.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3637.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3466.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
March 20 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|