California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024