Senate
|
09/22/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5647.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6707.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 1. Page 4145.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3986.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1. Page 3536.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|