California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1509 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Amended

Bill July 3, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024