|
06/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4820.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4718.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Set for hearing June 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4677.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5983.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
June 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3874.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3724.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|