California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill June 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 29, 2024

Amended

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill June 5, 2024