Senate
|
09/27/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 5634.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6709.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3011.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 578.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|