California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024