|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 383, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2744.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 17. Page 3315.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 1361.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1162.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
May 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 798.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 353.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|