California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB261 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 12, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023