|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 384, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2625.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 3151.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1163.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 938.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 546.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|