California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill September 7, 2023
Bill June 6, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023