|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 696, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2593.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2958.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1295.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1158.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 423.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|