California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB29 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill June 22, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023