|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 863, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2737.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3252.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1387.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1164.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 681.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|