California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB291 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill August 14, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023