|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 864, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2672.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3154.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1387.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1164.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 576.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|