California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill September 7, 2023
Bill June 29, 2023
Bill June 21, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023