Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2024
|
June 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
July 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 1290.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1164.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 793.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|